CA AB2248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69432.95 to the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Cal Grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2248 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2248 McCarty et al. By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2248 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2248 McCarty et al. By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2248 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6603.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5465.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69432.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 69433 | Amended Code | Citation Text |