CA AB2246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2714 of the Public Resources Code, relating to surface mining.
Title
Surface Mining and Reclamation Act of 1975: exemption: Metropolitan Water District of Southern California.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 2714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2246 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2246 |