CA AB2244 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4648.4, 4681.5, 4681.6, 4684.55, 4689.8, and 4691.9 of, and to add Section 4671 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental services: regional centers: provider rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback