CA AB2243 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6721 of the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health standards: heat illness: wildfire smoke.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2243 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2243 Eduardo Garcia et al By Stern (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2243 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2243 Eduardo Garcia et al By Stern (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2243 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 19.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5216.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 4985.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |