CA AB2243 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 13.5 (commencing with Section 31001) of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to medical cannabis, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medical cannabis: taxation: cannabis production and environment mitigation.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Sharon Runner [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2243 WOOD Third Reading Urgency (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2243 WOOD Third Reading Urgency (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5220.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5220.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5237.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 5238.). |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4448.) In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31001 | New Code | See Bill Text |