CA AB224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 51515) to Part 3 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Housing Finance Agency: financing agreements: affordable rental housing for school employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 224 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-23SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 16. Page 1994.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 26).
2017-05-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2017-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 25).
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-01-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
2017-01-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1601.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1616.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1646Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1682Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1724Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1750.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code51515New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback