CA AB224 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9321 of the Commercial Code, relating to business, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - AB 224 PORTANTINO Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB224 Portantino By Simitian (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 224 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB224 Portantino By Simitian (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 224 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-11 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3356.) | |
2009-09-10 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 10). | |
2009-09-09 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3230.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2224.) | |
2009-09-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). | |
2009-08-27 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1960.) | |
2009-08-26 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-08-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-08-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-03 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 982.) | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-02-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | |
2009-02-04 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Commercial Code | 9321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |