CA AB2235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2576 of the Education Code, relating to county community schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County community schools: funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2235 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2235 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5039.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5470.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code1981Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code2576Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback