CA AB2231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14028, 14029, and 14030 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
California Voting Rights Act of 2001.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |