CA AB2230 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal, amend, repeal, and add Section 11450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: temporary shelter and permanent housing benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2230 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Gipson et al. By Umberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2230 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Gipson et al. By Umberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2230 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 13.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 4978.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450 | New Code | See Bill Text |