CA AB2230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11756.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance abuse disorder treatment.
Title
Tobacco assessment.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11756.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2230 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2230 |