CA AB2229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10102 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential property insurance: disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2229 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2229 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10102Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code2073Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback