CA AB2228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 46392 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: school apportionments: wildfire mitigation.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2228 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5624.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46392.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |