CA AB2223 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 226 of the Labor Code, relating to wages.
Title
Wages: written statements.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2223 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2223 |