CA AB2220 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 67450, 67451, 67452, and 67453 of, to amend the heading of Part 40.3 (commencing with Section 67450) of Division 5 of Title 3 of, and to add Sections 67452.5 and 67453.5 to, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
College Student Athlete Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2220 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2220 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5622.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 4). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 67451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 67452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 67452.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 67453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 67453.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |