CA AB2219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39510 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
State Air Resources Board: members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |