CA AB2218 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21177.1 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: standing: proposed infill housing projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21177.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |