CA AB2218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4434.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4434.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 119 (commencing with Section 150900) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to access to health services.
Title
Transgender Wellness and Equity Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2218 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2218 Santiago et al. By Wiener (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2218 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2218 Santiago et al. By Wiener (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2218 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4434.). | |
2020-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 10. Page 5361.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 4787.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 150900 | New Code | See Bill Text |