CA AB2216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4502, 16590, 18010 and 22015 of, to add Section 22296 to, to repeal Section 22090 of, and to repeal and add Section 22010 to, the Penal Code, relating to prohibited weapons.
Title
Prohibited weapons: nunchaku.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22090 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22296 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2216 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2216 |