CA AB2210 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 68075.65 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: community colleges: refugees and holders of certain special immigrant visas: exemption from paying nonresident tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2210 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2210 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-29SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 4826.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 18).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code68075.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68075.65New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8240Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback