CA AB221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 15.5 (commencing with Section 18996.5) and Chapter 15.6 (commencing with Section 18997) of Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to food assistance programs, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency food assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 221 Santiago Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18996.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18997Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback