CA AB2208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12581, 12586.1, 12587, 12598, and 12599.6 of, and to add Section 12599.9 to, the Government Code, relating to charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable organizations: charitable fundraising platforms and platform charities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2208 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-20SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 4757.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2020-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12581Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12586.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12587Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12598Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12599.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12599.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback