CA AB2206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 9250 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: registration information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code4453Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code9250Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback