CA AB2205 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12017.5 to the Government Code, relating to state finance.
Title
State finance: line-item veto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |