CA AB2199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1246.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts: clinical laboratories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2199 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2199 Nazarian By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2199 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-05-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2020-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1246.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback