CA AB2198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1543 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to unclaimed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed property: secure payment of claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2198 Ting Assembly Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-20SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2020-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1543New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback