CA AB2197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 831.5 of the Penal Code, relating to custodial officers.
Title
Custodial officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2197 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2197 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2197 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4220.). |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4532.) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 831.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |