CA AB2196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22380 and 22381 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pilot Program for Increased Access to Responsible Small Dollar Loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2196 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2196 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
2020-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2020-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code22380Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22381Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback