CA AB2195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 372.5 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: nuisance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2195 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Becker (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2195 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2195 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5049.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 4821.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 27). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 372.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |