CA AB2193 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 32051 to, and to add Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 66305) to Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to hazing.
Title
Hazing: educational institutions: prohibition and civil liability: reports and resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2193 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2193 Holden et al. By Umberg (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2193 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2193 Holden et al. By Umberg (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2193 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 2.). |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 7.). |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 1. Page 5403.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32051 | New Code | See Bill Text |