CA AB2191 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 90018 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
California Consumer Financial Protection Law: annual report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 90018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |