CA AB219 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1720.9 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: concrete delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 219 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB219 Daly By Mendoza (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 219 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB219 Daly By Mendoza (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 219 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2834.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2349.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1862.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1720.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1722.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1722.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |