CA AB2185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 117 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: applicants licensed in other states: reciprocity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2185 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2185 |