CA AB218 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1276 and 1277 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 102426 and 102430 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 103400 and 103725 of, and to repeal and add Article 7 (commencing with Section 103425) of Chapter 11 of Part 1 of Division 102 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change of gender and sex identifier.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 218 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Ward et al. By Rubio (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 218 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
2021-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback