CA AB218 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 432.9 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment applications: criminal history.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Dickinson By De Le (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Dickinson Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Dickinson By De Le (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - State Assembly - AB 218 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - State Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - State Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2397.).
2013-09-11SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 2385.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator De León. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2386.)
2013-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2013-08-12SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1802.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-10AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 2).
2013-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-02-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2013-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code432.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_218&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130204_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130410_amended_asm_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130410_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130204_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130410_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20130919_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_bill_20131010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130530_1231PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130626_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130911_0844PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130911_0845PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_218_vote_20130912_1106AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback