CA AB2179 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1206.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 122440 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Hepatitis C testing.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2179 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2179 Gipson By Mitchell (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2179 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2179 Gipson By Mitchell (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2179 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6207.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5162.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5028.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122440 | New Code | See Bill Text |