CA AB2178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8557 and 8558 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency services.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2178 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4704.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |