CA AB2176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18255, 18260, 18405, 20155, 22815, 23685, 26045, 26890, 31640, 31700, and 32010 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2176 Jones-Sawyer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2176 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2176 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 20155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23685 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |