CA AB2174 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


An act to add Section 103876 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Ken Maddy California Cancer Registry.


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]


2016-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2016-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code103876New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code130301Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

Bill Comments