CA AB217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052, 17140, 17140.3, 17140.4, 17276, 17276.21, 17276.22, 17560.5, 17564, 19131.5, 23711, 23711.4, 24343, 24416, 24416.21, 24416.22, 24422.3, 24652, 24654, 24673.2, and 24701 of, to add Sections 17052.1, 17144.8, 17201.2, 17271, 17563.51, 17859, 24343.1, 24451.1, and 24652.6 to, and to repeal and add Sections 18031.5 and 24941.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Income taxation: credits: exclusions: federal conformity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Burke. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2279.) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 26). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |