CA AB2167 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 12. Page 6167.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 12. Page 6167.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56.05 and 56.06 of, and to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 56.18) to Part 2.6 of Division 1 of, the Civil Code, to amend Section 121010 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4903.6 of the Labor Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Information privacy: digital health feedback systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2167 Chau By Jackson (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2167 Chau By Jackson Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2167 Chau By Jackson (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2167 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2167 Chau By Jackson Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2167 Chau By Jackson (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2167 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 12. Page 6167.). |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5910.) |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 14. Page 5910.). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 5204.) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2). |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 121010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4903.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |