CA AB2165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7.1 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 37220, 45203, 79020, 79030, and 88203 of the Education Code, to amend Section 1100 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 6700, 19853, and 19853.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 4692 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election day holiday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and G.O.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback