CA AB2165 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32000 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: prohibitions: exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2165 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2165 Bonta By Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2165 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2165 Bonta By Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2165 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6470.). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5419.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 4496.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 32000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |