CA AB2164 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53069.4 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local ordinances: fines and penalties: cannabis.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB2164 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2164 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2164 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.). |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5587.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |