CA AB2164 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.13 and 23623.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credit: education and training.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Roderick Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |