CA AB216 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20104 and 20104.2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: claims.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 28). | |
2009-03-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-12 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent. | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |
2009-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2009-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20104.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |