CA AB2159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 15630.2 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to financial abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15630.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15630.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback