CA AB2156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 29010 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: manufacturers.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2156 Wicks By Kamlager (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2156 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2156 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4531.). |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 4982.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 29010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |