CA AB2155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 10095.1) to Part 1 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Bilingual-Oriented Social Equity Services Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10095.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |