CA AB215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53260 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Local agency employment contracts: maximum cash settlement.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB215 Alejo By Leyva (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 215 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 215 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2053.). |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 1908.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1761.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 13). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |